Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/13/2021 at 21:47:59 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank NA vs Staggs, Rebecca A

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Wells Fargo Bank NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Staggs, Rebecca A. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7072

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank NA

1000 W. Mcnab Road 3Rd Floor

Pompano Beach, FL 33069

Defendant

Staggs, Rebecca A

Riverview, FL 33579-7789

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAPLAN DE ENGLE , MAR A FLORENCIA GONZALEZ

Attorney at NADERPOUR & ASSOCIATES, PA

1000 W Mcnab Rd Fl 3

Pompano Beach, FL 33069

Defendant Attorney

MILLER VEAL , JENNIFER LYNN

Attorney at JENNIFER MILLER VEAL

3094 Williamsburg St

Sarasota, FL 34231

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

04/16/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/19/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OAS; Judgment Description: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION; Instrument Number: 2021272764; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Staggs, Rebecca A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Staggs, Rebecca A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 04-22-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Staggs, Rebecca A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNIFER LYNN MILLER VEAL