This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/16/2023 at 00:11:03 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. vs PENZER, DAVID

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PENZER, DAVID. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, C.. Christopher and Nash, Christopher. C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9993

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

12425 28Th Street North, Suite 200

St. Petersburg, FL 33716

Defendants

HERITAGE HARBOR GOLF & COUNTRY CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

C/O Jonathan J Ellis, Registered Agent Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick K, Llp 101 E Kennedy Blvd, Suite 2800

Tampa, FL 33602

PENZER, DAVID

Lutz, FL 33558

PENZER, LISA

Lutz, FL 33558

PENZER, RONNIE S

Coral Springs, FL 33071

PENZER, WILLIAM

Coral Springs, FL 33071

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Lutz, FL 33558

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Lutz, FL 33558

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANNING , PETER EARL

Attorney at EXL LEGAL, PLLC

12425 28Th St N Ste 200

St Petersburg, FL 33716

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS

12/01/2022: LIS PENDENS

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/15/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

12/15/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

12/15/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/15/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/15/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

12/15/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

12/15/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/01/2022: COMPLAINT

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

12/01/2022: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/01/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/01/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/01/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/01/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/01/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/01/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketFILE AT RC - SEND TO CSC - ROOM #101; Comment: User: Public, General with Email: Anonymous@hillsclerk.com. Documents Requested: Anonymous@hillsclerk.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketFILE NOT FOUND; Comment: Electronic File

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT- ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 12/13/2022 DEFT RONNIE S PENZER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: 12/08/2022 SUBSTITUTE JARRETT PENZER/CO-RESIDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 12/08/2022 DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 12/09/2022 DEFT HERITAGE HARBOR GOLF & COUNTRY CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: DEFT: WILLIAM PENZER- 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: DEFT: DAVID PENZER - 12/8/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE HARBOR GOLF & COUNTRY CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.; Defendant: PENZER, DAVID; Defendant: PENZER, LISA; Defendant: PENZER, RONNIE S; Defendant: PENZER, WILLIAM; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 2; Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X7; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE HARBOR GOLF & COUNTRY CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.; Defendant: PENZER, DAVID; Defendant: PENZER, LISA; Defendant: PENZER, RONNIE S; Defendant: PENZER, WILLIAM; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 2;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERITAGE HARBOR GOLF & COUNTRY CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lanning, Peter E