This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/13/2021 at 13:16:14 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. vs JENNINGS, CAROLYN JOYCE

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JENNINGS, CAROLYN JOYCE. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4908

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

3217 South Decker Lake Drive

Salt Lake City, UT 84119

Defendants

JENNINGS, CAROLYN JOYCE

Tampa, FL 33617

LEX SPECIAL ASSETS, LLC

251 Little Falls Drive

Wilmington, DE 19808

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAROLYN JOYCE JENNINGS

Tampa, FL 33617

UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION

Tampa, FL 33617

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANCHEZ , ALEXANDRA J

Attorney at HELLER & ZION, LLP

1428 Brickell Ave Ste 600

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorney

WEIDNER , MATTHEW DECELL

Attorney at MATTHEW D. WEIDNER, PA

250 Mirror Lake Dr N

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

06/16/2021: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/15/2021: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/15/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/15/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/15/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

Plaintiff's Certification Form

09/02/2021: Plaintiff's Certification Form

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/25/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/20/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

Signature Page For Clerk's Default

08/20/2021: Signature Page For Clerk's Default

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO

08/17/2021: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO

ORDER

08/12/2021: ORDER

NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY

08/20/2021: NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/06/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

07/21/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Certification Form; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: LEX SPECIAL ASSETS, LLC; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAROLYN JOYCE JENNINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION; Comment: FORECLOSURE MEDIATION 08/20/21 RF; Additional Info: Defendant: JENNINGS, CAROLYN JOYCE; Defendant: LEX SPECIAL ASSETS, LLC; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAROLYN JOYCE JENNINGS; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION; Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; Private Attorney: SANCHEZ , ALEXANDRA J; Private Attorney: WEIDNER , MATTHEW DECELL; Date Signed: 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NDUNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY; Judge: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; Private Attorney: SANCHEZ , ALEXANDRA J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: LEX SPECIAL ASSETS, LLC; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAROLYN JOYCE JENNINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; Private Attorney: SANCHEZ , ALEXANDRA J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; Private Attorney: SANCHEZ , ALEXANDRA J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lex Special Assets LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ ALEXANDRA J