This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/09/2019 at 08:03:07 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA vs IMHOFF, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 10/30/2014 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against IMHOFF, ROBERT. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Battles, L. Emmett and Kiser, D. Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0982

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Battles, L. Emmett

Kiser, D. Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

4919 Memorial Highway, Suite 200

Tampa, FL 33634

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

Tampa, FL 33611

CULBREATH KEY BAYSIDE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

5550 W. Executive Drive Ste. 250

Tampa, FL 33609

IMHOFF, JACKIE

Mayfield, KY 42066

IMHOFF, ROBERT

Mayfield, KY 42066

TENANT 1

Tampa, FL 33611-3051

TENANT 2

Tampa, FL 33611-3051

TENANT 3

Tampa, FL 33611-3051

TENANT 4

Tampa, FL 33611-3051

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IVAN D IVANOV, Esquire

IVANOV , IVAN DIMITROV

Attorney at IVANOV & WOLF , PLLC

3310 W Cypress St Ste 206

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorneys

FRANCIS EDWARD FRISCIA

APPLETON , ERIC NEWELL

Attorney at APPLETON, REISS & SKOREWICZ, PLLC

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 802

Tampa, FL 33602

MYERS, TROY HAROLD

Attorney at 2033 MAIN ST

Ste 600

Sarasota, FL 34237

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/28/2015: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/24/2014: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/31/2014: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/31/2014: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/31/2014: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/31/2014: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/30/2014: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/30/2014: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/30/2014: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF SALE

12/16/2015: NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/27/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/08/2015: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/15/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/31/2014: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/30/2014: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/30/2014: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/30/2014: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/30/2014: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER; Comment: RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE TO- BROCK AND SCOTT, PLLC, 1501 NW 49TH STREET, SUITE 200, FORT LAUDERDALE, FLORIDA 33309 (ORDER) SIGNED PER ORDER 01/30/17 BY ELB; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • LETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • ORDER ON - TO - FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT; Comment: ,DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • CASE REOPENED $50 FEE ASSESSED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • LETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING REOPEN FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2014
  • VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • Judgment Code: FJFC; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE; Instrument Number: 2015449110; Judge: Kiser, Mark D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2015259629

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Judgment Code: OOTF; Judgment Description: ORDER ON - TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2017042896; Judge: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CULBREATH KEY BAYSIDE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRISCIA , FRANCIS EDWARD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Appleton, Eric N, ESQ.