This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 11:25:36 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank NA vs Billett, Ken W

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Wells Fargo Bank NA filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Billett, Ken W. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, Lisa A, Allen, Lisa. A and Allen, A. Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6622

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, Lisa A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank NA

1000 W. Mcnab Road 3Rd Floor

Pompano Beach, FL 33069

Defendant

Billett, Ken W

Temple Terrace, FL 33617-3839

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMSHED , SABERIN

Attorney at NADERPOUR & ASSOCIATES, P.A.

1000 W Mcnab Rd Fl 3

Pompano Beach, FL 33069

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/26/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/26/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/26/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/26/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/27/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/26/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

08/03/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: KEN W BILLETT 8/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Billett, Ken W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamshed, Saberin