This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/11/2022 at 07:36:56 (UTC).

WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, LLC vs AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 WEBB ROOFING CONSTRUCTION, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5662

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, LLC

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

UMANA , NICOLAS

ITURRIZAGA , JORDI

Defendant Attorney

BALIK, LILLI SOPHIA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

07/08/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/08/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/08/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/08/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

05/16/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE

03/02/2022: NOTICE

ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

02/09/2022: ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

AMENDED NOTICE

01/13/2022: AMENDED NOTICE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

12/20/2021: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

ORDER GRANTING

11/02/2021: ORDER GRANTING

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

10/28/2021: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/21/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/21/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/21/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/21/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

10/21/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022252217; Judge: Wolfe, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Date Signed: 02/09/2022; Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Cancelled Comments: Voluntary Dismissal of Cause; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/91757641087 MEETING ID 917 5764 1087PASSWORD 973927 Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, LLC; Private Attorney: CANAURA , JOSE MIGUEL, Jr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, LLC; Date Signed: 11/02/2021; Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cabal, Emma; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, LLC; Plaintiff: Zucchetti, Jorge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cabal, Emma; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, LLC; Plaintiff: Zucchetti, Jorge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cabal, Emma; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, LLC; Plaintiff: Zucchetti, Jorge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cabal, Emma; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, LLC; Plaintiff: Zucchetti, Jorge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cabal, Emma; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, LLC; Plaintiff: Zucchetti, Jorge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cabal, Emma; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, LLC; Plaintiff: Zucchetti, Jorge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less