This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/20/2023 at 13:07:55 (UTC).

WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC vs SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6149

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CANAURA , JOSE MIGUEL, Jr

ITURRIZAGA , JORDI

FINK , MICHAEL GORDON

Defendant Attorney

MILLER , CHANDRA LEE

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/27/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/27/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

04/26/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

04/26/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

04/20/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

NOTICE

04/19/2023: NOTICE

AMENDED NOTICE

04/17/2023: AMENDED NOTICE

NOTICE

04/13/2023: NOTICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/12/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/12/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

03/28/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/21/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ORDER

03/13/2023: ORDER

ORDER

03/08/2023: ORDER

STIPULATED MOTION

02/28/2023: STIPULATED MOTION

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

02/28/2023: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/17/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF NON-BINDING ARBITRATION JUNE 13, 2023@1:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF NON-BINDING ARBITRATION Tuesday, June 13, 2023 AT 1PM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: JADEJA, DAKSHA; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: JADEJA, DAKSHA; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: JADEJA, DAKSHA; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: JADEJA, DAKSHA; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: JADEJA, DAKSHA; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: JADEJA, DAKSHA; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less