This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/05/2022 at 13:33:39 (UTC).

WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC vs FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, Paul. L, Huey, Paul L and Huey, L. Paul. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4909

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, Paul. L

Huey, Paul L

Huey, L. Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

Defendant

FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ITURRIZAGA , JORDI

Defendant Attorney

BRODSKY , TAMARAH EVE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/14/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/12/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

12/20/2021: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL

12/15/2021: ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL

ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL

12/12/2021: ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL

JOINT STIPULATION

12/08/2021: JOINT STIPULATION

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

12/08/2021: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/19/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/19/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022161666; Judge: Huey, Paul L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT S MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY - 04/05/2022 @145PM; Additional Info: Defendant: FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: VIA ZOOM April 5, 2022 at 1:45 p.m.; Additional Info: Defendant: FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC; Private Attorney: LOW , DAVID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC; Private Attorney: LOW , DAVID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Date Signed: 12/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, MONA; Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, STEPHEN; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, MONA; Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, STEPHEN; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, MONA; Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, STEPHEN; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, MONA; Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, STEPHEN; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, MONA; Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, STEPHEN; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, MONA; Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, STEPHEN; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, MONA; Plaintiff: ABBRIANO, STEPHEN; Plaintiff: WEBB ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less