This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/14/2023 at 16:15:32 (UTC).

WAYNE STOCK - Estate

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 WAYNE STOCK - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Pomponio, Denise. A and Pomponio, A. Denise. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4410

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Pomponio, Denise. A

Pomponio, A. Denise

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

KLOOS, ERIC

Saint Paul, MN 55108

KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA

Saint Paul, MN 55108

BANNER, BARBARA JEAN

Dallas, TX 75235

STOCK, STUART RAND

Skokie, IL 60077

Claimant

FLORIDA MEDICAL CLINIC, LLC

38135 Market Square

Zephyrhills, FL 33542

Decedent

STOCK, WAYNE CARLTON

Tampa, FL 33647

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

MCGINNIS , ELAINE NOELLE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ELAINE MCGINNIS, P.A.

324 N Dale Mabry Hwy Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33609

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: ATTY LTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED VIA ACH - eCERTIFY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $74.97, ELAINE@ESTATELAWTAMPA.COM 01/05/23; Additional Info: Claimant: FLORIDA MEDICAL CLINIC, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC NOTICE TO CREDTR; Additional Info: Decedent: STOCK, WAYNE CARLTON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED VIA ACH - eCERTIFY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERS REP; Comment: NO BOND; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KLOOS, ERIC; Beneficiary: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Co-Personal Representative: KLOOS, ERIC; Personal Representative: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Petitioner: KLOOS, ERIC; Petitioner: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KLOOS, ERIC; Beneficiary: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Co-Personal Representative: KLOOS, ERIC; Personal Representative: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Petitioner: KLOOS, ERIC; Petitioner: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Date 2: 12/20/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: BRET KLOOS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Personal Representative: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Petitioner: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: KARI KLOOS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Personal Representative: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Petitioner: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-O WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Personal Representative: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Petitioner: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Comment: ERIC KLOOS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Personal Representative: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Petitioner: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Comment: KATHLEEN ELLA KLOOS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Personal Representative: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Petitioner: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS; Comment: KATHLEEN ELLA KLOOS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Personal Representative: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Petitioner: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Personal Representative: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA; Petitioner: KLOOS, KATHLEEN ELLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less