Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/01/2019 at 12:14:22 (UTC).

Washington, Catherine vs Moe Mart Inc

Case Summary

On 07/28/2016 Washington, Catherine filed an Other lawsuit against Moe Mart Inc. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas, K. Cheryl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7109

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas, K. Cheryl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Washington, Catherine

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

WILLIAMS, J HULON, III

Tampa, FL 33609

Hess Mart Inc

C/O Hess Corporation, One Hess Plaza

Woodbridge, NJ 07095

Saed, Sabris B.

Tampa, FL 33647

Hess Corporation

1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Saed, Ayman

Temple Terrace, FL 33637

Hess Retail Stores LLC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Hess Retail Operations

Plantation, FL 33324

HESS EXPRESS

Tampa, FL 33612

Moe Mart Inc

1444 E. Fletcher Ave.

Tampa, FL 33612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAGANO , JAMES MICHAEL

Attorney at STOCKHAM LAW GROUP

109 S Edison Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorneys

KANTOR , ADAM SCOTT

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

VERONA , CATHERINE M

201 N Franklin St Ste 3050

Tampa, FL 33602

STOLER , ROBERT MAXIM

Attorney at STOLER RUSSELL KEENER VERONA P.A.

201 N Franklin St Ste 3050

Tampa, FL 33602

FERNANDEZ, DANIEL J

Attorney at FERNANDEZ & HERNANDEZ, LLC

3002 W Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/11/2016: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/11/2016: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO DISMISS

09/12/2016: MOTION TO DISMISS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/08/2016: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/31/2016: MOTION TO DISMISS

COMPLAINT

07/28/2016: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/28/2016: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/28/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/28/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

08/04/2017: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/28/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/04/2016: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

10/05/2016: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/12/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/31/2016: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/29/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/28/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/28/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION 07/19/2017 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • NOTICE OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: 06/27/2017 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Comment: (SECOND) CATHERINE WASHINGTON 7/19/17 @ 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Comment: CATHERINE WASHINGTON - 6/22/17 @ 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Comment: CATHERINE WASHINGTON 6/22/17 @ 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Comment: 2X, NO SUBPOENAS ATTACHED, COS 4/12/17

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: OGMTF; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2016479654; Judge: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: OGMTF; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2016456207; Judge: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Judgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017308856; Judge: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hess Retail Stores LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HESS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAGANO , JAMES MICHAEL