This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 10/31/2022 at 05:45:03 (UTC).

Wansley, Mark vs Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Wansley, Mark filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9339

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wansley, Mark

Defendants

BACCUS GLOBAL LLC

LG Sourcing, Inc.

Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEBER , BRANDEN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

11/22/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/22/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/23/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

COMPLAINT

11/22/2021: COMPLAINT

LETTER TO

11/23/2021: LETTER TO

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

05/03/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/91757641087 MEETING ID 917 5764 1087PASSWORD 973927; Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022227158; Judge: Wolfe, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wansley, Mark;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE PAYMENT FOR SUMMONS WITHOUT REQUEST FOR SUMMONS - bweber@forthepeople.com ; dduncan@forthepeople.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wansley, Mark;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wansley, Mark;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wansley, Mark;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less