This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/01/2022 at 15:46:58 (UTC).

Walker, Sally vs American Honda Motor Co. Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Walker, Sally filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against American Honda Motor Co Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Farfante, Darren D, Farfante, D. Darren and Farfante, Darren. D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4243

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Farfante, Darren D

Farfante, D. Darren

Farfante, Darren. D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walker, Sally

Gainesville, FL 32605

Defendants

3M COMPANY

American Honda Motor Co. Inc.

1919 Torrance Blvd

Torrance, CA 90501

AT&T, CORP

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, LLC

BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY

COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY

CONOPCO, INC.

COTY US LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, LP

MICHIGAN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

PARAMOUNT GLOBAL INC.

PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL

PFIZER INC.

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.

REVLON CONSUMER PRODUCTS CORPORATION

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EARLY , KELSEY ANNE

Attorney at VINSON LAW

5505 W Gray St

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorneys

ROMANCE , MARK ANTHONY

Attorney at DAY PITNEY LLP

North Tower Fl 14 396 Alhambra Cir

Miami, FL 33134

SALAS , HENRY

Attorney at COLE SCOTT & KISSANE

9150 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1400

Miami, FL 33156

CRIST , MICHAEL JAMES

Attorney at TORRES VICTOR

1451 W. Cypress Creek Road 1451 W Cypress Creek Rd Ste 211

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

MEDINA , EDUARDO J

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

4770 Biscayne Blvd Ste 1000

Miami, FL 33137-3232

COLLINGS , CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

Attorney at COLLINGS LAW FIRM

255 Alhambra Cir Ste 800

Coral Gables, FL 33134

FERGUSON , TIMOTHY JOHN

Attorney at FOLEY MANSFIELD PLLP

4770 Biscayne Blvd Ste 1000

Miami, FL 33137

WEEKLEY , PAUL MARSHALL

Attorney at WEEKLEY SCHULTE VALDES, LLC

1635 N Tampa St Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33602

TOMLIN , TRACY EDWARD

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

301 S College St Fl 23

Charlotte, NC 28202

TOPKIN , SANFORD ROY

Attorney at TOPKIN & PARTLOW, P.L.

1166 W Newport Center Dr Ste 309

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/30/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/27/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/27/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/27/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/27/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/27/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/27/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/27/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/27/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/27/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/24/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/24/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/24/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/24/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/23/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/23/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

06/22/2022: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: JOIN COURT ZOOM MEETING HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/4205308406 MEETING ID 420 530 8406 SMART PHONE USE "ONE TAP MOBILE"FEATURE AT THE FOLLOWING NUMBER 17866351003 Judicial Officer: Farfante, Darren D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: 3M COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: VIA ZOOM JULY 11, 2022@10:30 A.M; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Walker, Sally

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: LETTER ATTCHD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Walker, Sally

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: 3M COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PFIZER INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: PFIZER INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: MEDLINE INDUSTRIES, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Walker, Sally

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Walker, Sally

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Walker, Sally

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Walker, Sally

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Walker, Sally

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Walker, Sally

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Walker, Sally

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Walker, Sally

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Walker, Sally

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Walker, Sally

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Michigan Bell Telephone Company is a litigant

Latest cases where REVLON CONSUMER PRODUCTS CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where COTY US INC. is a litigant