Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/23/2021 at 10:27:54 (UTC).

Vogler, Nettie Everna - Estate

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 Vogler, Nettie Everna - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0705

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioners and Trustees

Latham, Tricia C

Niceville, FL 32578

Florida Baptist Children's Home

1015 Sikes Blvd

Lakeland, FL 33815

The Vogler Family Trust dated am and

400 Little Gem Ct

Niceville, FL 32578

John's Hopkins All Children's Hospital

C/O John Hopkins All Children Foundation 500 Seventh Avenue South Street

Petersburg, FL 33701

MARY LOU PAYTON FOUNDATION

Brandon, FL 33509-2941

ELROD, PATSY

Frost Proof, FL 33843

MOYE, DELBERT

Bowling Green, FL 33834

WILLIAMS, MARGY

Polk City, FL 33868

COX, MICHAEL

Greenville, SC 29607

TOMLINSON, ANGELA

Fort Pierce, FL 33843

BELL SHOALS BAPTIST CHURCH

Brandon, FL 33511

GRICE, TONYA

Bowling Green, FL 33834

FIRST UNITED METHODIST CHURCH

4531 Us Hwy 17 North

Bowling Green, FL 33834-5073

Decedent

Vogler, Nettie Everna

Brandon, FL 33511

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioner and Trustee Attorney

PRINCE-TROUTMAN , STACEY A

Attorney at AKERMAN LLP

420 S Orange Ave Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketAMENDED INVENTORY OF P.R.; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS; Comment: 1ST PUB: 07/01/20; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK; Comment: RETURNING CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL-APPT PR; Comment: * AND FIRST CODICIL *... BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C; Date 2: 06/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF INFORMAL REQUEST FROM; Comment: SANDRA VALDEZ TO STACEY PRINCE-TROUTMAN, ESQ DATED APRIL 7, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: ALLISON M TRIPP DATED 3/4/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Decedent: Vogler, Nettie Everna; Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: E-FILED; Additional Info: Decedent: Vogler, Nettie Everna; Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Comment: A: Death Certificate for Annie Ruth Vogler; Additional Info: Decedent: Vogler, Nettie Everna; Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketRENUNCIATION; Comment: to Serve as Succ. Personal Rep. - Delbert Moye,; Additional Info: Decedent: Vogler, Nettie Everna; Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Decedent: Vogler, Nettie Everna; Personal Representative: Latham, Tricia C; Petitioner: Latham, Tricia C; Trustee: Latham, Tricia C

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA BAPTIST CHILDREN'S HOME is a litigant

Latest cases where First United Methodist Chrurch is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHNS HOPKINS ALL CHILDRENS HOSPITAL INC A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE-TROUTMAN, STACEY A