Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/30/2021 at 13:42:13 (UTC).

VILLAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SERVICES vs VILLARREAL, XAVIER

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 VILLAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SERVICES filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against VILLARREAL, XAVIER. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7237

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT SERVICES

C/O Joanne Mcanlis Mcanlis Law Group 711 E 65Th Street

Indianapolis, IN 46220

Defendants

VILLARREAL, MELANIE

Brandon, FL 33511

VILLARREAL, XAVIER

Brandon, FL 33511

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

04/19/2021: NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

04/19/2021: NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL TO; Additional Info: Defendant: VILLARREAL, XAVIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL TO; Additional Info: Defendant: VILLARREAL, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: VILLARREAL, MELANIE; Defendant: VILLARREAL, XAVIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL TO; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: VILLARREAL, MELANIE; Defendant: VILLARREAL, XAVIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketFee Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less