Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/11/2020 at 16:52:55 (UTC).

Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor vs Okoh, James I, Medical Doctor

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Okoh, James I, Medical Doctor. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stoddard, C.. Ralph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1276

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

National Radiology Consultants, P.A.

Lutz, FL 33558

Okoh, James I, Medical Doctor

Tampa, FL 33647-2301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDS , DARRYL R

Attorney at JOHNSON POPE BOKOR RUPPEL & BURNS, LLP

401 E Jackson St Ste 3100

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

GREENLEE, PAIGE A, Esquire

Attorney at GREENLEE LAW PLLC

1304 S Desoto Avenue Suite 203

Tampa, FL 33606

GREENLEE , PAIGE ADONNA

Attorney at GREENLEE LAW PLLC

1304 S De Soto Ave Ste 203

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

BANKRUPTCY

02/18/2019: BANKRUPTCY

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

02/15/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

02/15/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/05/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/05/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/05/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/05/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/05/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/05/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/05/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/05/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: BANK; Judgment Description: BANKRUPTCY; Judge: Stoddard, Ralph C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY; Additional Info: Defendant: Okoh, James I, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketBANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Okoh, James I, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION AND THE PARTIES' STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT **GRANTED** 04/29/19 RCS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor; Date Signed: 04/29/2019; Judicial Officer: Stoddard, Ralph C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Comment: ( A ) FILING # 88695819; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Okoh, James I, Medical Doctor; Plaintiff: Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Comment: EXHIBIT A; Additional Info: Defendant: Okoh, James I, Medical Doctor; Plaintiff: Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DIANA OKOH ON 2-12-19; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Venkataperumal, Satish, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 darrylr@jpfirm.com ; gwenb@jpfirm.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: National Radiology Consultants, P.A.; Defendant: Okoh, James I, Medical Doctor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 darrylr@jpfirm.com ; gwenb@jpfirm.com

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENLEE, PAIGE