This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 14:10:51 (UTC).

Velocity Investments LLC vs Murphy, Tracey

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 Velocity Investments LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Murphy, Tracey. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5383

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Velocity Investments LLC Assignee Of Webbank

1001 N Dixie Hwy

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Velocity Investments LLC

1001 N Dixie Hwy

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

WebBank

Defendant

Murphy, Tracey

Apollo Beach, FL 33572-1520

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORONA , CAROLINA AIMEE

Attorney at BREMER LAW AND ASSOCIATES

190 Broad St Ste 1E

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/30/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/30/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/01/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/01/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/19/2021: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TRACEY MURPHY, 12/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Murphy, Tracey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Velocity Investments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Velocity Investments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Velocity Investments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Velocity Investments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEBBANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CORONA, CAROLINA AIMEE