This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/14/2020 at 08:39:18 (UTC).

VAZQUEZ, RICARDO vs CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER AGPT136113

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 VAZQUEZ, RICARDO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER AGPT136113. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stoddard, C.. Ralph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5558

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAZQUEZ, RICARDO

18Th Floor, FL 33133

Defendant

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER AGPT136113

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA , DAVID FERNANDO

Attorney at MARIN, ELJAIEK, LOPEZ & MARTINEZ, P.L.

2601 S Bayshore Dr Fl 18

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Defendant Attorney

GOLDSTEIN , JUDITH BETH

Attorney at BERK, MERCHANT & SIMS PLC

2 Alhambra Plz Ste 700

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/11/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER AGPT136113

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER AGPT136113

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: SERVED ON UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON - 8/21/2020; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VAZQUEZ, RICARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VAZQUEZ, RICARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: VAZQUEZ, RICARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: FROM Aristides Kico Diaz, Esq.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VAZQUEZ, RICARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VAZQUEZ, RICARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VAZQUEZ, RICARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VAZQUEZ, RICARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: VAZQUEZ, RICARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 - mellaw5@mellawyers.com ; eservice@mellawyers.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER AGPT136113

    Read MoreRead Less