This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/19/2022 at 01:09:40 (UTC).

VASQUEZ, DIANA vs MORAN FOODS LLC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 VASQUEZ, DIANA filed an Other lawsuit against MORAN FOODS LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tesche Arkin, Caroline. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0394

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VASQUEZ, ALFREDO

Tampa, FL 33607

VASQUEZ, DIANA

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

MORAN FOODS LLC

C/O 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAPENA , JOSE A

Attorney at JOSE A. DAPENA, P.A.

5975 Sunset Dr Ste 102

Miami, FL 33143

Defendant Attorney

GAGAIN, EDWARD FRANCIS, III

Attorney at GOLDEN SCAZ GAGAIN, PLLC

1135 Marbella Plaza Dr

Tampa, FL 33619-7905

 

Court Documents

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/20/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/18/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/14/2022: COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

01/14/2022: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/14/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/14/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/14/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

06/03/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/03/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/13/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

04/06/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/06/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/22/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/22/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/22/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/04/2022: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: WEBEX NUMBER 904-900-2303 ENTER ACCESS CODE: 132 878 9681 Judicial Officer: Tesche Arkin, Caroline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: MORAN FOODS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: MORAN FOODS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: MORAN FOODS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, ALFREDO; Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: MORAN FOODS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: DEFENDANT S SUPPLEMENTAL - TO PLAINTIFF; Additional Info: Defendant: MORAN FOODS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, ALFREDO; Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, ALFREDO; Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, ALFREDO; Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, ALFREDO; Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, ALFREDO; Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, ALFREDO; Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, ALFREDO; Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, ALFREDO; Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, ALFREDO; Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, ALFREDO; Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORAN FOODS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dapena, Jose A.