This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/09/2020 at 02:31:39 (UTC).

VALERO,VANESA VS. RUIZ,RAFAEL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 VALERO,VANESA filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RUIZ,RAFAEL. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, Frances M and Perrone, M. Frances. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8748

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, Frances M

Perrone, M. Frances

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VALERO, VANESA

Tampa, FL 33634

Respondent

RUIZ, RAFAEL

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RODRIGUEZ , YESENIA BITOR

Attorney at THE SPRING OF TAMPA BAY

Po Box 5147

Tampa, FL 33675

Respondent Attorney

OVERFIELD , KELLY AYERS

Attorney at KELLY A. OVERFIELD, P.A.

Po Box 172151

Tampa, FL 33672

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketFILE RECEIVED AT RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE; Comment: 1vol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketFILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF TERMINATION OF LIMITED APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: VALERO, VANESA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketDISMISSAL AFTER HEARING (FAMILY); Additional Info: Petitioner: VALERO, VANESA; Respondent: RUIZ, RAFAEL; Date Signed: 06/06/2019; Vol./Book: 26690, Page: 787, Number of Pages: 787

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: MODIFY TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, AMENDED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION, UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT, PETITION, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: RUIZ, RAFAEL; Date Served: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketAMENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION; Comment: Your temporary injunction for protection has been extended. A new hearing date has been set. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. Certified copies of your Temporary Injunction are available at any of ; Additional Info: Petitioner: VALERO, VANESA; Respondent: RUIZ, RAFAEL; Date Signed: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE CASE FILED AT THE OUTREACH CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITH CHILD(REN); Comment: Your request for a temporary injunction against Domestic Violence has been granted. The judge has set a hearing. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. Certified copies of your Temporary Injunction are ; Additional Info: Petitioner: VALERO, VANESA; Respondent: RUIZ, RAFAEL; Date Signed: 12/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • HearingAmended Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • HearingAmended Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • HearingAmended Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • HearingTemporary Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less