This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/09/2019 at 20:26:38 (UTC).

USF FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs WILSON, NICHOLE

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 USF FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILSON, NICHOLE. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Oster, Cynthia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3482

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Oster, Cynthia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USF FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

812 W. Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. Blvd., Ste. 101

Tampa, FL 33603

Defendant

WILSON, NICHOLE

Port Richey, FL 34668

Garnishee

PASCO COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCIARRINO , THOMAS KENNETH, Jr

Attorney at WETHERINGTON HAMILTON PA

812 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd Suite 101

Tampa, FL 33603

Defendant Attorney

RUBIN , ARTHUR DREW

Attorney at WE PROTECT CONSUMERS, P.A.

Po Box 89282

Tampa, FL 33689

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/31/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION

07/25/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING

07/22/2019: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING

WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED

07/16/2019: WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

07/16/2019: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

OBJECTION AND OR TRAVERSE TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION

07/16/2019: OBJECTION AND OR TRAVERSE TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING

06/12/2019: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING

ANSWER

05/17/2019: ANSWER

COURT TICKET

05/13/2019: COURT TICKET

FINAL JUDGMENT

05/13/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/30/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/23/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/15/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/15/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/15/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/15/2019: COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Comment: DFDT'S - PLTFF'S ATTY'S OBJECTION TO CLAIM ON EXEMPTION AND MOTION TO DISSOLVE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: WILSON, NICHOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED - DFDT'S - OF CASE LAW; Additional Info: Defendant: WILSON, NICHOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: WILSON, NICHOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Comment: SET 8/5/19 @ 4:15 PM; Additional Info: Defendant: WILSON, NICHOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING; Additional Info: Defendant: WILSON, NICHOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEAD OF HOUSEHOLD; Additional Info: Defendant: WILSON, NICHOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Comment: 7/16/19 CSO tks@whpa-law.com; ; Additional Info: Defendant: WILSON, NICHOLE; Garnishee: PASCO COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS; Date Signed: 07/16/2019; Judicial Officer: Oster, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE; Comment: WOCGI tks@whpa-law.com; ; Additional Info: Defendant: WILSON, NICHOLE; Garnishee: PASCO COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: USF FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 2/20/2019 DEFT NICHOLE WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: WILSON, NICHOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: USF FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: USF FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: USF FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: USF FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: ODWG; Judgment Description: ORDER DISMISSING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Judge: Oster, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: FJ; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2019208119; Judge: Oster, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less