This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/15/2023 at 16:50:27 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs COTHERN, MATTHEW S.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against COTHERN, MATTHEW S. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, L. Paul and Huey, Paul. L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9340

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

4755 Technology Way Suite 104

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendants

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

200 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10285

COTHERN, MATTHEW S.

Plant City, FL 33566

COTHERN, TIFANEY L.

Plant City, FL 33566

DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

400 North Tampa Street

Tampa, FL 33602

GREENALL, CAROLYN A.

Kennesaw, GA 30152

INFRA-METALS, CO.

C/O Ct Corporation System, Registered Agent 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

RARE EARTH SCIENCES, INC.

C/O Jeffrey R. Stull, Registered Agent 602 S Blvd

Tampa, FL 33606

SOUTHEASTERN ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC

C/O Michael Kappaz, Registered Agent 2601 N. Falkenburg Rd.

Tampa, FL 33619

SUNTRUST BANK

C/O Corporation Service Company, Its Registered Ag 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW S. COTHERN A/K/A MATTHEW S. COTHREN

Plant City, FL 33566

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TIFANEY L. COTHERN A/K/A TIFANEY L. COTHREN

Plant City, FL 33566

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Plant City, FL 33566

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Plant City, FL 33566

WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

C/O H. Web Melton, Registered Agent 1801 N. Highland Ave.

Tampa, FL 33602

WEINSTOCK, JAY

Weston, FL 33331

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD , HARRIS SETH

Attorney at HOWARD LAW GROUP

4755 Technology Way Ste 104

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendant Attorneys

TANCREDO , CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY

Attorney at THE TANCREDO LAW FIRM, P.A.

1306 Thonotosassa Rd

Plant City, FL 33563

RUDY , JOHN FORNEY, III

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE/USDOJ

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/19/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/19/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

11/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

11/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

11/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

11/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

11/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Defendant: INFRA-METALS, CO.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Defendant: INFRA-METALS, CO.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: COTHERN, MATTHEW S.; Defendant: COTHERN, TIFANEY L.; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW S. COTHERN A/K/A MATTHEW S. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TIFANEY L. COTHERN A/K/A TIFANEY L. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #2; Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: COTHERN, MATTHEW S.; Defendant: COTHERN, TIFANEY L.; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW S. COTHERN A/K/A MATTHEW S. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TIFANEY L. COTHERN A/K/A TIFANEY L. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #2; Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Additional Info: Defendant: COTHERN, MATTHEW S.; Defendant: COTHERN, TIFANEY L.; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW S. COTHERN A/K/A MATTHEW S. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TIFANEY L. COTHERN A/K/A TIFANEY L. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #2; Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: COTHERN, MATTHEW S.; Defendant: COTHERN, TIFANEY L.; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW S. COTHERN A/K/A MATTHEW S. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TIFANEY L. COTHERN A/K/A TIFANEY L. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #2; Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: COTHERN, MATTHEW S.; Defendant: COTHERN, TIFANEY L.; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW S. COTHERN A/K/A MATTHEW S. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TIFANEY L. COTHERN A/K/A TIFANEY L. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #2; Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: COTHERN, MATTHEW S.; Defendant: COTHERN, TIFANEY L.; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW S. COTHERN A/K/A MATTHEW S. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TIFANEY L. COTHERN A/K/A TIFANEY L. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #2; Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: COTHERN, MATTHEW S.; Defendant: COTHERN, TIFANEY L.; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW S. COTHERN A/K/A MATTHEW S. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TIFANEY L. COTHERN A/K/A TIFANEY L. COTHREN; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #2; Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFRA-METALS CO is a litigant

Latest cases where Walden Lake Community Association, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNTRUST BANKS INC is a litigant