This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/17/2023 at 15:29:37 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs DUNCAN, LINDA L

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DUNCAN, LINDA L. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5877

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

DUNCAN, LINDA L

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LINDA L DUNCAN

WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.

Not Classified By Court

MY GREEN LAKE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUNER , CAN

Defendant Attorneys

MELTON , HOWELL WEBSTER, III

ASMER , NIURKA FERNANDEZ

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS

07/12/2022: LIS PENDENS

BID INFORMATION SHEET

04/17/2023: BID INFORMATION SHEET

Fee Worksheet

04/17/2023: Fee Worksheet

COMPUTATION SHEET

04/12/2023: COMPUTATION SHEET

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE

03/31/2023: PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE

$70.00 ELECTRONIC JUDICIAL SALE FEE PAYMENT

03/24/2023: $70.00 ELECTRONIC JUDICIAL SALE FEE PAYMENT

NOTICE OF SALE

03/16/2023: NOTICE OF SALE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

02/20/2023: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

FEE LETTER SENT

02/17/2023: FEE LETTER SENT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

02/08/2023: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF FILING

01/11/2023: NOTICE OF FILING

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

12/13/2022: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

JOINT STIPULATION

12/06/2022: JOINT STIPULATION

JOINT STIPULATION

12/06/2022: JOINT STIPULATION

ORDER GRANTING

12/06/2022: ORDER GRANTING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/16/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/16/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

09/19/2022: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingMORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT; Comment: GOOD FAITH DEPOSIT $10,835.00; Additional Info: Successful Bidder: MY GREEN LAKE LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBID INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Worksheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPUTATION SHEET; Comment: COB 4/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE; Comment: BUSINESS OBSERVER; Additional Info: Date of Sale: 04/17/2023;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket$70.00 ELECTRONIC JUDICIAL SALE FEE PAYMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Comment: Business Observer; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Date of Sale: 04/17/2023;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Docket$70.00 ELECTRONIC JUDICIAL SALE FEE DUE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertification of Original Note Possession FS702.015(4); Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less