This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/13/2023 at 02:09:43 (UTC).

US Bank Trust National Association vs HELICON FOUNDATION REPAIR SYSTEMS, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 US Bank Trust National Association filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HELICON FOUNDATION REPAIR SYSTEMS, INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3833

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US Bank Trust National Association

1031 North Miami Beach Blvd

North Miami Beach, FL 33162

Defendants

DOMINGUEZ, FAUSTINO

Lutz, FL 33549

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FAUSTINO DOMINGUEZ

Lutz, FL 33549

ALL PARTIES HAVING OR CLAIMING TO HAVE ANY RIGHT, TITLE OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION IF THE ABOVE DEFENDANTS ARE ALIVE AND IF ONE OR MORE OF SAID DEFENDANTS ARE DEAD, THEIR UNKNOWN SPOUSES, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES, CREDITORS AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR AG

HELICON FOUNDATION REPAIR SYSTEMS, INC.

One Lake Morton Drive

Lakeland, FL 33801

HERNANDEZ, MARIA L.

Lutz, FL 33549

HOLLANDER EXTERIORS INC.

2119 W. Columbus Drive

Tampa, FL 33607

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA L. HERNANDEZ

Lutz, FL 33549

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Lutz, FL 33549

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Lutz, FL 33549

WYNDGATE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

12906 Tampa Oaks Blvd Suite 100

Temple Terrace, FL 33637

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUGGAR , JASON

Attorney at GHIDOTTI BERGER, LLP

1031 N Miami Beach Blvd

North Miami Beach, FL 33162

Defendant Attorney

FOWLER , NICK

Attorney at FLORIDA CONSUMER LAWYERS

Po Box 341499

Tampa, FL 33694

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

08/24/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/24/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/24/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/24/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/24/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/09/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

AGREED ORDER

08/04/2022: AGREED ORDER

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/16/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

AFFIDAVIT

07/11/2022: AFFIDAVIT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

05/09/2022: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/09/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: DOMINGUEZ, FAUSTINO; Defendant: HERNANDEZ, MARIA L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: DOMINGUEZ, FAUSTINO; Defendant: HERNANDEZ, MARIA L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: DOMINGUEZ, FAUSTINO; Defendant: HERNANDEZ, MARIA L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: DOMINGUEZ, FAUSTINO; Defendant: HERNANDEZ, MARIA L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: DOMINGUEZ, FAUSTINO; Defendant: HERNANDEZ, MARIA L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: VIA ZOOM September 29, 2022, at 10:30 a.m; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank Trust National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME **GRANTED**; Additional Info: Defendant: ALL PARTIES HAVING OR CLAIMING TO HAVE ANY RIGHT, TITLE OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT; Defendant: ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION IF THE ABOVE DEFENDANTS ARE ALIVE AND IF ONE OR MORE OF SAID DEFENDANTS ARE DEAD, THEIR UNKNOWN SPOUSES, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES, CREDITORS AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR AGAINST THEM; Defendant: DOMINGUEZ, FAUSTINO; Defendant: HELICON FOUNDATION REPAIR SYSTEMS, INC.; Defendant: HERNANDEZ, MARIA L.; Defendant: HOLLANDER EXTERIORS INC.; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FAUSTINO DOMINGUEZ; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA L. HERNANDEZ; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #2; Defendant: WYNDGATE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.; Date Signed: 08/04/2022; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: DOMINGUEZ, FAUSTINO; Defendant: HERNANDEZ, MARIA L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank Trust National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: FINAL- N??FORECLOSURE????; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank Trust National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank Trust National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank Trust National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank Trust National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank Trust National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank Trust National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank Trust National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank Trust National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank Trust National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank Trust National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank Trust National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HELICON FOUNDATION REPAIR SYSTEMS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOLLANDER EXTERIORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WYNDGATE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant