This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/12/2021 at 10:43:19 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A. TRUSTEE vs Swinson, Steve

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 U S BANK TRUST, N A TRUSTEE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Swinson, Steve. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3329

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A.

4767 New Broad Street

Orlando, FL 32814

LSF9 Master Participation Trust

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A. TRUSTEE

4767 New Broad Street

Orlando, FL 32814

Defendants

Swinson, Steve

Riverview, FL 33578

Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession

Riverview, FL 33578

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIPPMAN , MARK R.

Attorney at LIPPMAN LAW OFFICES, P.A.

4767 New Broad St

Orlando, FL 32814

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/14/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/14/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT

09/03/2021: COMPLAINT

ANSWER

09/17/2021: ANSWER

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/08/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/08/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/03/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/03/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/03/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/03/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/03/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/03/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Swinson, Steve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Additional Info: Defendant: Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Additional Info: Defendant: Swinson, Steve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Swinson, Steve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A. TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A. TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A. TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A. TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A. TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LSF9 Master Participation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIPPMAN MARK R