This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/11/2023 at 20:01:26 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs VALENTIN, ANGEL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against VALENTIN, ANGEL. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbas, Rex, Daniel, L. Helene and Daniel, Helene. L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1087

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Barbas, Rex

Daniel, L. Helene

Daniel, Helene. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

STATE OF FLORIDA

THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANGEL VALENTIN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF YOLANDA VALENTIN

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

VALENTIN, ANGEL

VALENTIN, YOLANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUGGAR , JASON

Defendant Attorneys

ASMER , NIURKA FERNANDEZ

TANCREDO , CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Certification Form

12/21/2022: Plaintiff's Certification Form

ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ON

05/11/2022: ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ON

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/09/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

JOINT STIPULATION

05/03/2022: JOINT STIPULATION

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

04/28/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/25/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

04/25/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

ORDER

04/05/2022: ORDER

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

02/08/2022: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Certification Form; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ON; Comment: ORDER ON PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; THE STIPULATION IS GRANTED AND THE DEFAULT ENTERED ON 3/28/2022 AGAINST THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC IS SET ASIDE; Additional Info: Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Date Signed: 05/11/2022; Judicial Officer:: Daniel, Helene L;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: VALENTIN, ANGEL; Defendant: VALENTIN, YOLANDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: EXHIBIT(S) ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: OF REFERRAL TO FORECLOSURE MEDIATION 04/01/22 RF; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA; Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANGEL VALENTIN; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF YOLANDA VALENTIN; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 2; Defendant: VALENTIN, ANGEL; Defendant: VALENTIN, YOLANDA; Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Private Attorney: DUGGAR , JASON; Private Attorney: TANCREDO , CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY; Date 2: 04/01/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO SUMMONS SERVED TIME NOT EXPIRED (60 DAYS SUMMONS SERVED ON 2/10/2022); Additional Info: Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA; Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANGEL VALENTIN; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF YOLANDA VALENTIN; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 2; Defendant: VALENTIN, ANGEL; Defendant: VALENTIN, YOLANDA; Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x8; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA; Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANGEL VALENTIN; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF YOLANDA VALENTIN; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 2; Defendant: VALENTIN, ANGEL; Defendant: VALENTIN, YOLANDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less