This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/26/2019 at 13:36:23 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs MCCLARY, STEPHEN H

Case Summary

On 08/15/2017 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MCCLARY, STEPHEN H. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Holder, P. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7686

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Holder, P. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

255 South Orange Ave Suite 900

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

Sun City Center, FL 33573

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEPHEN H MCCLARY

Sun City Center, FL 33573

MCCLARY, BERAE

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

Sun City Center, FL 33573

DANBURY BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

1520 Danbury Dr

Sun City Center, FL 33573

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES CREDITORS GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF STEPHEN H MCCLARY

MCCLARY, STEPHEN H

Sun City Center, FL 33573

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HIRSCH , MIKAEL LINDSEY

Attorney at QUINTAIROS, PRIETO, WOOD & BOYER, P.A.

255 S Orange Ave Ste 900

Orlando, FL 32801-3454

CHIDA, KELLEY ANNE, Esquire

255 S. Orange Avenue. , Suite 900

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

IVANOV , IVAN DIMITROV

Attorney at IVANOV & WOLF , PLLC

3310 W Cypress St Ste 206

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING

02/19/2019: NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS

02/12/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

02/12/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

02/12/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

02/12/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

02/12/2019: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

01/28/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/23/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

01/23/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/15/2017: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/15/2017: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/15/2017: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/15/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/15/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/15/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/15/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/15/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY

01/23/2019: NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S- FINAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: DANBURY BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE; Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES CREDITORS GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF STEPHEN H MCCLARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S); Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: DANBURY BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE; Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES CREDITORS GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF STEPHEN H MCCLARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 5 efiling@qpwblaw.com ; mikael.hirsch@qpwblaw.com ; servicecopies@qpwblaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: DANBURY BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; Defendant: MCCLARY, STEPHEN H; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEPHEN H MCCLARY; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 5 efiling@qpwblaw.com ; mikael.hirsch@qpwblaw.com ; servicecopies@qpwblaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 5 efiling@qpwblaw.com ; mikael.hirsch@qpwblaw.com ; servicecopies@qpwblaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 5 efiling@qpwblaw.com ; mikael.hirsch@qpwblaw.com ; servicecopies@qpwblaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 5 efiling@qpwblaw.com ; mikael.hirsch@qpwblaw.com ; servicecopies@qpwblaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Code: NDUNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY; Judge: Holder, Gregory P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chida, Kelley Anne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKAEL L HIRSCH