This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/13/2023 at 11:23:16 (UTC).

US Bank National Association vs Dean, Elizabeth

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 US Bank National Association filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Dean, Elizabeth. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4615

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US Bank National Association

1901 W Cypress Creek Road

Ft. Lauerdale, FL 33309

Defendants

Dean, Elizabeth

Seffner, FL 33584

Florida Housing Finance Corporation

227 North Bronough Street Suite 500

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Unknown Spouse Of Bruce Hutchcraft

Seffner, FL 33584

Unknown Spouse Of Elizabeth Dean

Seffner, FL 33584

Unknown Tenant in Possession of the Subject Property

Seffner, FL 33584

Greene, John Thomas

Unknown, FL 00000

Greene, Michael Anthony

Unknown, FL 00000

Greene, Robert Andrew

Unknown, FL 00000

Greene, William Allen

Unknown, FL 00000

Lenske, Barbara Suzanne

Unknown, FL 00000

Mcginnis, Cathryn louise

Unknown, FL 00000

Unknown Heirs Beneficiaries of the Estate of Elizabeth Dean

Unknown, FL 00000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATEL , PRATIK R

Attorney at DE CUBAS & LEWIS, PA

Po Box 771270

Coral Springs, FL 33077

Defendant Attorney

KATZ, ETHAN SETZER

Attorney at FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

227 N Bronough St Ste 5000

Tallahassee, FL 32301-1367

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

06/02/2022: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/24/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVING

08/23/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/23/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/23/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

ORDER

08/22/2022: ORDER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/18/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

08/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

08/18/2022: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

NOTICE OF SERVING

08/18/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING

ORDER GRANTING

08/17/2022: ORDER GRANTING

MOTION TO AMEND

07/29/2022: MOTION TO AMEND

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

07/22/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/21/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

STATUS REPORT

07/15/2022: STATUS REPORT

MOTION TO - FOR

07/15/2022: MOTION TO - FOR

COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO

07/11/2022: COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO

E-FILED NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

07/07/2022: E-FILED NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Unknown Heirs Beneficiaries of the Estate of Elizabeth Dean

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Comment: COURT'S ORDER REQUIRING ELECTRONIC/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Unknown Spouse Of Bruce Hutchcraft

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: REQUIRING ELECTRONIC/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES ON 08/31/22 AT 9:45 AM VIA ZOOM 08/22/22 RMB; Additional Info: Defendant: Dean, Elizabeth; Defendant: Florida Housing Finance Corporation; Defendant: Greene, John Thomas; Defendant: Greene, Michael Anthony; Defendant: Greene, Robert Andrew; Defendant: Greene, William Allen; Defendant: Lenske, Barbara Suzanne; Defendant: Mcginnis, Cathryn Louise; Defendant: Unknown Heirs Beneficiaries of the Estate of Elizabeth Dean; Defendant: Unknown Spouse Of Bruce Hutchcraft; Defendant: Unknown Spouse Of Elizabeth Dean; Defendant: Unknown Tenant in Possession of the Subject Property; Plaintiff: US Bank National Association; Private Attorney: KATZ, ETHAN SETZER; Private Attorney: PATEL , PRATIK R; Date 2: 08/22/2022; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NDUNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Unknown Spouse Of Bruce Hutchcraft

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATEL, PRATIK