This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/26/2019 at 13:35:34 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs APOLINARIO, ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 08/15/2017 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against APOLINARIO, ANTONIO. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Nielsen, A. Richard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7682

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Nielsen, A. Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

6409 Congress Avenue

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendants

HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY, FLORIDA

9927 Delaney Lake Dr, FL 33619

VALENZUELA, LUZ MARIE

Tampa, FL 33615

MANILO, DENIS

Tampa, FL 33615

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FRANKLIN SALAZAR

Tampa, FL 33615

SALAZAR, FRANKLIN

Tampa, FL 33615

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

Co C T Corporation System 1200 S Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANTONIO APOLINARIO A/K/A ANTONIO E APOLINARIO

Tampa, FL 33615

STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Tallahassee, FL 32399

GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

C O President Vice President Or Any Other Officer 9927 Delaney Lake Dr

Tampa, FL 33619

CLERK OF THE COURT IN AND FOR HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY, INC

Tampa, FL 33602

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LUZ MARIE VALENZUELA A/K/A LUZ VALENZUELA

Tampa, FL 33615

APOLINARIO, ANTONIO

Tampa, FL 33615

FANGDI II, LLC

Not Classified By Court

HILLSBOROUGH HEIGHTS LLC

2825 N. Nebraska Ave.

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANSWELL , WENDY C.

Attorney at ROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ & SCHNEID, PL

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorneys

WEIDNER , MATTHEW D, Esquire

Attorney at WEIDNER LAW, P.A.

250 Mirror Lake Dr N

St Petersburg, FL 33701-3200

HAIDERMOTA , YUSUF ESMAIL

Attorney at KASS SHULER, P.A.

Po Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601-0800

BOHNER , DALE KENT

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH CO CLERK OF THE COURT

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 13

Tampa, FL 33602-4932

WINARSKY , AMY J, Esquire

Attorney at MARCADIS SINGER PA

5104 S West Shore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

10/25/2018: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

02/14/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

12/06/2018: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/15/2017: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/16/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING

01/09/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/15/2017: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/15/2017: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

09/08/2018: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

116 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketDEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT; Comment: BALANCE PAID $ 86,225.70 + CLERK FEES $ 1,359.00 + DOC STAMPS $ 630.70; Additional Info: Successful Bidder: HILLSBOROUGH HEIGHTS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBID INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Worksheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketDEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT; Comment: GOOD FAITH DEPOSIT $ 4,505.00; Additional Info: Successful Bidder: HILLSBOROUGH HEIGHTS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF BID TO; Comment: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE; Comment: BUSINESS OBSERVER; Additional Info: Date of Sale: 02/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE DATA SHEET; Comment: EDS # 190179

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketMORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Code: FJFC; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE; Instrument Number: 2019025153; Judge: Nielsen, Richard A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hillsborough Heights, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant