This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/15/2023 at 18:04:54 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY vs FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7418

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AARON, JUSTIN

FULLER, AUDREY JONES

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1110 W Commercial Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendant

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC

Corporate Service Company As R.A. 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODRIGUEZ , DIANA ELIZABETH

Attorney at UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY

414 Se 3Rd Pl

Dania Beach, FL 33004

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

10/14/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/14/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

10/15/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE

11/15/2022: NOTICE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Voluntary Dismissal of Cause; Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Schultz-Kin, Leslie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022552877; Judge: Schultz-Kin, Leslie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less