This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/21/2022 at 21:12:42 (UTC).

Universal Pain Specialists, Inc.,JOHNSON, WARREN vs Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Universal Pain Specialists, Inc ,JOHNSON, WARREN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5497

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNSON, WARREN

Universal Pain Specialists, Inc.

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

UNIVERSAL SPINE AND JOINT SPECIALISTS

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/12/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/12/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

08/12/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/13/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/13/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/23/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/14/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022452147; Judge: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Pain Specialists, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Pain Specialists, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Pain Specialists, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Pain Specialists, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Pain Specialists, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Pain Specialists, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Pain Specialists, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Pain Specialists, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL SPINE & JOINT SPECIALISTS is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Pain Specialists, Inc. A/A/O Melanie Braccia is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER