This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/03/2022 at 07:12:29 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC vs USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3302

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION LLC A/A/O AARON COLLINS

3307 Home Court

Tampa, FL 33611

COLLINS, AARON

UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

3307 Home Court

Tampa, FL 33611

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACKINNON , ROBERT FRANKLIN, Jr

Attorney at ROBERT MACKINNON LAW, PA

3307 Home Ct

Tampa, FL 33611

Defendant Attorney

TOBIN , LEE ANDREW

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS

07/18/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO STAY

07/18/2022: MOTION TO STAY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/18/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/12/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/24/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/24/2022: E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/22/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

INTERROGATORIES

06/22/2022: INTERROGATORIES

EXHIBIT

06/22/2022: EXHIBIT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/22/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/22/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/22/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/22/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/22/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/22/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/22/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/22/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/22/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS OF COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY; Comment: PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, STRIKE AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRTION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION a/a/o Jarad Sevinsky is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc A/A/O Andrew Adams is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACKINNON , ROBERT FRANKLIN, Jr