This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/28/2023 at 13:25:56 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC vs PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, Joseph. M and Tompkins, M. Joseph. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8443

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, Joseph. M

Tompkins, M. Joseph

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HILL, MICHAEL

TORITOM SERVICES, INC

UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACKINNON , ROBERT FRANKLIN, Jr

Defendant Attorney

FOUNTAIN , GENEVA R.

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/21/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS

OBJECTION

03/21/2023: OBJECTION

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

03/21/2023: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

08/29/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/02/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

08/02/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/08/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/08/2022: E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/06/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/06/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/06/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/06/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/06/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

INTERROGATORIES

07/06/2022: INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/06/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/06/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/06/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/06/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023164306; Judge: Tompkins, Joseph M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: OR ALTERNATIVELY, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ABATE OR STAY, AND COMPEL APPRAISAL, AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO STAY DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Comment: AND MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY, INCLUDING DEPOSITIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less