This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/29/2022 at 10:08:46 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lopez, S. Susan and Lopez, Susan. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4997

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, S. Susan

Lopez, Susan. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ, GISELA

UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

3307 Home Court

Tampa, FL 33611

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACKINNON , ROBERT FRANKLIN, Jr

Attorney at ROBERT MACKINNON LAW, PA

3307 Home Ct

Tampa, FL 33611

Defendant Attorney

JOZWIAK , ERICA LOREN

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

07/07/2022: NOTICE

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

06/24/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

06/24/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

06/24/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

06/22/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/15/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/26/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/26/2022: E-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/25/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/25/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/25/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/25/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/25/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

INTERROGATORIES

05/25/2022: INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/25/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/25/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/25/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/25/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: JOZWIAK , ERICA LOREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 30 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL CALIBRATION AND DIAGNOSTICS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc A/A/O Andrew Adams is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOZWIAK , ERICA LOREN