This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/12/2021 at 03:52:15 (UTC).

Universal Calibration and Diagnostics LLC vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Universal Calibration and Diagnostics LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5505

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Universal Calibration and Diagnostics LLC

520 2Nd Ave. S.

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

STURGES, JOANN

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLAGGE , ANDREW JAMES

Attorney at DENMON PEARLMAN

520 2Nd Ave S

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/12/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/12/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/09/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY 08/05/2021; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STURGES, JOANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration and Diagnostics LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration and Diagnostics LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration and Diagnostics LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration and Diagnostics LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration and Diagnostics LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc A/A/O Andrew Adams is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant