This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/08/2022 at 19:42:28 (UTC).

Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc vs Progressive Select Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/15/2022 Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Progressive Select Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3070

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc A/A/O Tiffany Hoskins

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

HOSKINS, TIFFANY

Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at UNITED LAW GROUP PA

1920 West Bay Dr Ste 1

Largo, FL 33770

Defendant Attorney

SATMARY , GAUGE CODI

Attorney at RESNICK & LOUIS, P.C.

3157 N Alafaya Trl

Orlando, FL 32826

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/15/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/15/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/19/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/19/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/07/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/23/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/23/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

02/28/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/28/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

02/28/2022: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/12/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022193737; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Comment: AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY, INCLUDING DEPOSITIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: OR ALTERNATIVELY, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ABATE OR STAY AND MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc A/A/O Andrew Adams is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM