This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/05/2022 at 01:14:06 (UTC).

Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc vs Progressive Express Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Progressive Express Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2060

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc A/A/O Diego Diaz

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

DIAZ, DIEGO

Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

Defendant

Progressive Express Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at UNITED LAW GROUP PA

1920 West Bay Dr Ste 1

Largo, FL 33770

Defendant Attorney

FOUNTAIN , GENEVA R.

Attorney at BOYD & JENERETTE, P.A.

201 N Hogan St Ste 400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/17/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/17/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/17/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/21/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/21/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/06/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

07/22/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/22/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Express Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Express Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Express Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Calibration And Diagnostics Llc A/A/O Andrew Adams is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Express Insurance Company is a litigant