This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 01/19/2022 at 13:58:04 (UTC).

Unique Chiropractic, Inc,LAWRENCE, DEJA vs Mga Insurance Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 Unique Chiropractic, Inc,LAWRENCE, DEJA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mga Insurance Company, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5291

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Unique Chiropractic, Inc., D/B/A Florida Spine & Injury Institute A/A/O Deja Lawrence

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

FLORIDA SPINE & INJURY INSTITUTE

LAWRENCE, DEJA

Unique Chiropractic, Inc

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

Mga Insurance Company, Inc.

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/30/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/30/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/04/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/04/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/30/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/30/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/30/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

11/30/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/30/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/15/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/16/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/16/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021662303; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Mga Insurance Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Unique Chiropractic, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Unique Chiropractic, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Unique Chiropractic, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Unique Chiropractic, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Unique Chiropractic, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Unique Chiropractic, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Unique Chiropractic, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Unique Chiropractic, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA SPINE & INJURY INSTITUTE is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIQUE CHIROPRACTIC INC DOING BUSINESS AS FLORIDA SPINE & INJURY AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR GATES, HUNTER is a litigant

Latest cases where MGA Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER