Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/15/2020 at 03:31:58 (UTC).

Ullrich, Joseph Edward - Estate

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 Ullrich, Joseph Edward - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Corvo, T. Vivian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0708

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Corvo, T. Vivian

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

Holmes, David

Oak Park, IL 60302

Ullrich, Mark

Manlius, NY 13104

Liechty, Laurie

Cicero, NY 13039

O'Connor, Trisha

Manlius, NY 13104

Ullrich, Deborah

Liverpool, NY 13088

Claimants

BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM INC

2995 Drew St, 2Nd Fl, Auto/Legal Dept

Clearwater, FL 33759

INPHYNET CONTRACTING SRV, LLC

C/O Dcm Services 7601 Penn Ave S Suite A600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-5004

STATE OF FLORIDA, AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

Tallahassee, FL 32308

ACCORD MEDICAL GROUP, PLLC

5112 N Habana Ave

Tampa, FL 33614-6873

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

C/O Dcm Services 7601 Penn Ave S Suite A600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-5004

EMERGENCY MED ASSOC OF TAMPA BAY

C/O Americollect, Inc P O Box 1566

Manitowac, WI 54221-1566

Decedent

Ullrich, Joseph Edward

Tampa, FL 33617

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

DANDAR , DEBRA LYNN

Attorney at TAMPA BAY ELDER LAW CENTER

3611 W Azeele St

Tampa, FL 33609

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketORD DETERMINING HOMESTEAD; Comment: (AMENDED); Additional Info: Decedent: Ullrich, Joseph Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketORD DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE; Comment: MARK ULLRICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketPET TO DET HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 06/22/20; Additional Info: Claimant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Holmes, David; Petitioner: Holmes, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 03/06/20; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: DANDAR , DEBRA LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: DEBORAH ULLRICH; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Holmes, David; Petitioner: Holmes, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: TRICIA O'CONNOR; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Holmes, David; Petitioner: Holmes, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-O WILL; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Holmes, David; Petitioner: Holmes, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: E-FILED; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Holmes, David; Petitioner: Holmes, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: LAURIE LIECHTY; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Holmes, David; Petitioner: Holmes, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: MARK ULLRICH; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Holmes, David; Petitioner: Holmes, David

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accord Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where EMERGENCY MED ASSOC OF TAMPA BAY is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM INC is a litigant

Latest cases where INPHYNET CONTRACTING SRV LLC is a litigant