Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/06/2021 at 02:06:44 (UTC).

UDR Inc vs Gonzalez, Joel

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 UDR Inc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Gonzalez, Joel. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6074

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Lakewood Place Apartments

Po Box 62884

Ft. Myers, FL 33906

UDR Inc

Po Box 62884

Ft. Myers, FL 33906

Defendants

Odell, Chacity

Brandon, FL 33510

Gonzalez, Joel

Brandon, FL 33510

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLK , BRIAN PETER

Attorney at HEIST, WEISSE & WOLK P.A.

5246 Clayton Ct

Fort Myers, FL 33907

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

04/06/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

03/31/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: Gonzalez, Joel; Date 2: 04/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: Odell, Chacity; Date 2: 04/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UDR Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2021162895; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Gonzalez, Joel; Defendant: Odell, Chacity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JOEL GONZALEZ, 3/18/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SUBSTITUTE - CHACITY ODELL, 3/18/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Gonzalez, Joel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Odell, Chacity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UDR Inc; Plaintiff Doing Business As: The Lakewood Place Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UDR Inc; Plaintiff Doing Business As: The Lakewood Place Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UDR Inc; Plaintiff Doing Business As: The Lakewood Place Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: UDR Inc; Plaintiff Doing Business As: The Lakewood Place Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UDR Inc; Plaintiff Doing Business As: The Lakewood Place Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: UDR Inc; Plaintiff Doing Business As: The Lakewood Place Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Lakewood Place Apartments is a litigant

Latest cases where UDR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian P Wolk