This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/25/2023 at 09:08:51 (UTC).

U S Bank National Association vs Santana Utrera, Lazaro

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 U S Bank National Association filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Santana Utrera, Lazaro. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, C.. Christopher and Nash, Christopher. C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0657

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U S Bank National Association

Defendants and Decedents

Castellano Gantes, Yinela

Hillsborough County Clerk Of Court

Santana Utrera, Lazaro

State Of Florida Department Of Revenue

Unknown Spouse Of Lazaro Santana Utrera

Unknown Tenant In Possession Of The Subject Property

Unknown Tenant In Possession Of The Subject Proper

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEWIS , COREY MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

FARRIOR , THOMAS RICHARD

GIBSON , JEFFREY W.

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

03/24/2023: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

03/23/2023: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ORDER SETTING PRE TRIAL AND NON JURY TRIAL

03/23/2023: ORDER SETTING PRE TRIAL AND NON JURY TRIAL

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/23/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION TO - FOR

03/21/2023: MOTION TO - FOR

MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL

03/21/2023: MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL

NOTICE TO SET FOR TRIAL

03/21/2023: NOTICE TO SET FOR TRIAL

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

03/20/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

NOTICE OF INTENT

03/18/2023: NOTICE OF INTENT

NOTICE OF FILING

01/24/2023: NOTICE OF FILING

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

01/24/2023: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/24/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/24/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/24/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/24/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/24/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/24/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/24/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 503View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO SUMMONS SERVED TIME NOT EXPIRED (20 DAYS SUMMONS SERVED ON 2/27/2023) AS TO DEFENDANT, LAZARO SANTANA UTRERA; SUMMONS SERVED TIME NOT EXPIRED (40 DAYS SUMMONS SERVED ON 2/6/2023) AS TO DEFENDANT, STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE; Additional Info: Decedent: State Of Florida Department Of Revenue; Defendant: Santana Utrera, Lazaro;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING PRE TRIAL AND NON JURY TRIAL; Comment: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING PRE-TRIAL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Date Signed: 03/23/2023; Judicial Officer:: Nash, Christopher C.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: APPEAR VIRTUALLY TRIAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO SET FOR TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Decedent: State Of Florida Department Of Revenue; Defendant: Santana Utrera, Lazaro;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT; Comment: TO OFFER AT TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U S Bank National Association;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less