Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/30/2021 at 03:51:02 (UTC).

TURNER, KRISTIN vs TURNER, JUSTIN ARON

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 TURNER, KRISTIN filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TURNER, JUSTIN ARON. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa, Allen, Lisa. A and Allen, Lisa A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5263

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, Lisa A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TURNER, KRISTIN

Tampa, FL 33637

Respondent

TURNER, JUSTIN ARON

Thonotosassa, FL 33637

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingTemporary Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 306 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL RESPONDENT SERVED; Comment: Document electronically transmitted to HCSO on 2021-04-27 09:17. ; Additional Info: Petitioner: TURNER, KRISTIN; Respondent: TURNER, JUSTIN ARON; Date Signed: 04/27/2021; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: ODRS-ORDER OF DISMISSAL RESPONDENT SERVED; Additional Info: Petitioner: TURNER, KRISTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, PETITION, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: TURNER, JUSTIN ARON; Date Served: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE INTAKE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketQUESTIONNAIRE; Additional Info: Petitioner: TURNER, KRISTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN); Comment: Your request for a temporary injunction against Domestic Violence has been granted. The judge has set a hearing. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. Certified copies of your Temporary Injunction are ; Additional Info: Petitioner: TURNER, KRISTIN; Respondent: TURNER, JUSTIN ARON; Date Signed: 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFILE SENT TO; Comment: TAMPA VIA INTEROFFICE. DOCUMENTS - TEMPORARY ORDER, SHERIFF INFO, INFO SHEET, PETITION, RELATED CASES, NON LAWYER, INTAKE QUESTIONNAIRE, COVID QUESTIONNAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Additional Info: Petitioner: TURNER, KRISTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Respondent: TURNER, JUSTIN ARON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less