Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/17/2021 at 14:04:00 (UTC).

TUCKER, BROOKE vs MARTIN, NICOLLETE

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 TUCKER, BROOKE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MARTIN, NICOLLETE. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, Frances M, Perrone, Frances. M and Perrone, M. Frances. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5227

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, Frances M

Perrone, Frances. M

Perrone, M. Frances

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TUCKER, BROOKE

Tampa, FL 33610

Respondent

MARTIN, NICOLLETE

Gibsonton, FL 33534

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: FINAL INJUNCTION, FINAL, STALKING; Additional Info: Respondent: MARTIN, NICOLLETE; Date Served: 06/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Petitioner: TUCKER, BROOKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingOrder Setting Hearing; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET; Comment: FINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT; Comment: RECEIPT OF FJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT INJUNCTION STALKING VIOLENCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: TUCKER, BROOKE; Respondent: MARTIN, NICOLLETE; Date Signed: 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ORDER, PETITION, ORDER SETTING HEARING; Additional Info: Respondent: MARTIN, NICOLLETE; Date Served: 04/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketQUESTIONNAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Petitioner: TUCKER, BROOKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTAY AWAY FROM; Comment: FLORIDA ENT AND ALLERGY 1139 NIKKI VIEW DR., BRANDON FL 33511; WINTHROP CHARTER SCHOOL 6204 SCHOLARS HILL LN, RIVERVIEW, FL 33578

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: Based on the facts stated in your petition, the court has set a hearing to take testimony and make a ruling on the petition. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. A supplemental petition with additiona; Additional Info: Petitioner: TUCKER, BROOKE; Respondent: MARTIN, NICOLLETE; Date 2: 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Additional Info: Petitioner: TUCKER, BROOKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Petitioner: TUCKER, BROOKE

    Read MoreRead Less