Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/05/2021 at 17:10:29 (UTC).

TRUVIEWMOLD, LLC vs SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 TRUVIEWMOLD, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa, Allen, Lisa. A and Allen, Lisa A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5567

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, Lisa A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRUVIEWMOLD, LLC a/a/o BELINDA MACK

250 N. Orange Ave., Suite 605

Orlando, FL 32801

MACK, BELINDA

TRUVIEWMOLD, LLC

250 N. Orange Ave., Suite 605

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAZ , ARISTIDES JUAN

Attorney at MARIN, ELJAIEK, LOPEZ & MATRINEZ

250 N Orange Ave Ste 605

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

06/11/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/10/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/10/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/10/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 306 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MACK, BELINDA; Plaintiff: TRUVIEWMOLD, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEWMOLD, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEWMOLD, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEWMOLD, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEWMOLD, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEWMOLD, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEWMOLD, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEWMOLD, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRUVIEWMOLD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARISTIDES JUAN DIAZ, ESQ