This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/12/2023 at 02:15:48 (UTC).

TRUVIEW MOLD, LLC vs OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 TRUVIEW MOLD, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Old Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, M. Frances, Perrone, Frances M, Smith, A. Matthew and Smith, Matthew. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5358

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, M. Frances

Perrone, Frances M

Smith, A. Matthew

Smith, Matthew. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AUSTIN, DAVID

TRUVIEW MOLD, LLC

Defendant

OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SERRANO , JALITZA

Defendant Attorney

WANK , JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/12/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/12/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

08/15/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/12/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

INTERROGATORIES

08/12/2022: INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/24/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

09/19/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

COURT TICKET

09/19/2022: COURT TICKET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/11/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

12/20/2022: MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/13/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023017834; Judge: Smith, Matthew A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUSTIN, DAVID; Plaintiff: TRUVIEW MOLD, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION V PER AO S-2022-032

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: AT PRE-TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEW MOLD, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AUSTIN, DAVID; Plaintiff: TRUVIEW MOLD, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEW MOLD, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEW MOLD, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEW MOLD, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEW MOLD, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEW MOLD, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEW MOLD, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TRUVIEW MOLD, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less