This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/30/2023 at 11:27:25 (UTC).

TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP,Brock, Jared vs GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP,Brock, Jared filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Old Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, Matthew. A and Smith, A. Matthew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1588

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, Matthew. A

Smith, A. Matthew

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brock, Jared

TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIGORI , KEITH PATRICK

Defendant Attorney

LOTT , MEGHAN ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/08/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/08/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/08/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/28/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/02/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/02/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/01/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/01/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/01/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/06/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/06/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/06/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/06/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/06/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/06/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/06/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/06/2023: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO FILE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less