This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/27/2023 at 02:44:00 (UTC).

TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC,Dipaolo, Maria vs LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC,Dipaolo, Maria filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, James. S and Giardina, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6941

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, James. S

Giardina, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC

Dipaolo, Maria

Defendant

LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

LANCASTER , JENNY M.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/21/2023: NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/21/2023: NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/06/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/06/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/31/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/31/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/31/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/16/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/16/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/16/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/16/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/16/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/16/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/13/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/13/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/02/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/27/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/27/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC; Private Attorney: GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC; Private Attorney: GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC; Private Attorney: GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TOTAL VITALITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less