This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/26/2021 at 05:41:18 (UTC).

Timothy Cymanski LLC,Stenfors, Brittany vs Progressive American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 Timothy Cymanski LLC,Stenfors, Brittany filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Progressive American Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle and Ober, Joelle. Ann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4615

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Ober, Joelle. Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Timothy Cymanski LLC d/b/a Spine & Sports Therapy

8551 W Sunrise Blvd. Ste 304

Plantation, FL 33322

Spine & Sports Therapy

Stenfors, Brittany

Timothy Cymanski LLC

8551 W Sunrise Blvd. Ste 304

Plantation, FL 33322

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

600 North Westshore Blvd., Suite #500

Tampa, FL 33609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALY , JOHN CHRISTOPHER, Jr

Attorney at DALY & BARBER, PA

8551 W Sunrise Blvd Ste 304

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN, JESSICA ZLOTNICK

Attorney at ROIG LAWYERS

1255 S Military Trl Ste 100

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/19/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/21/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/21/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/12/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/12/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/12/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Timothy Cymanski LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Timothy Cymanski LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Timothy Cymanski LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Timothy Cymanski LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Timothy Cymanski LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John C, Jr.