This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/16/2021 at 05:49:47 (UTC).

Timothy Cymanski LLC,Flack, Mary vs Ocean Habor Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Timothy Cymanski LLC,Flack, Mary filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ocean Habor Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9585

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Flack, Mary

Spine & Sports Therapy

Timothy Cymanski LLC

8551 W. Sunrise Blvd

Plantation, FL 33322

Defendant

Ocean Habor Casualty Insurance Company

P.O. Box 452799

Sunrise, FL 33345

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALY , JOHN CHRISTOPHER, Jr

Attorney at DALY & BARBER, PA

8551 W Sunrise Blvd Ste 304

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

MANGENEY , AUGUST WILLIAM

Attorney at LDP LAW AND ASSOCIATES

11555 Heron Bay Blvd Ste 100A

Coral Springs, FL 33076

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/08/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/23/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/23/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/22/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/22/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Timothy Cymanski LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Ocean Habor Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Ocean Habor Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Timothy Cymanski LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Timothy Cymanski LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Timothy Cymanski LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Timothy Cymanski LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AUGUST MANGENEY