This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/18/2021 at 01:35:56 (UTC).

TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC,Colledge, Joseph vs 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC,Colledge, Joseph filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, S. James and Moody, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7749

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, S. James

Moody, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Colledge, Joseph

Defendant

21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

ACOSTA FARMER, OLGA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANABRIA & MARSH

1200 S Pine Island Rd Ste 725

Plantation, FL 33324-4408

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/23/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/02/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/18/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/18/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order; Additional Info: Defendant: 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIMOTHY CYMANSKI, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.