This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/14/2021 at 11:30:10 (UTC).

Thrive Chiropractic Health Center Incorporated,STRICKLAND, JOSHUA vs Progressive Select Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Thrive Chiropractic Health Center Incorporated,STRICKLAND, JOSHUA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Progressive Select Insurance Company, a foreign corporation. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5679

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thrive Chiropractic Health Center Incorporated

121 West Forsyth

Jacksonville, FL 32202

STRICKLAND, JOSHUA

Defendants

Progressive Select Insurance Company

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Progressive Select Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAGAN , JONATHAN JAMES

Attorney at CAGAN & CAGAN PLLC

121 W Forsyth St Ste 810

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3857

Defendant Attorney

PHIPPS , KYLE JAMES

Attorney at PROGRESSIVE PIP HOUSE COUNSEL

3230 W Commercial Blvd Ste 400

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/06/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/15/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/14/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/14/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/14/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021265200; Judge: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STRICKLAND, JOSHUA; Plaintiff: Thrive Chiropractic Health Center Incorporated; Private Attorney: CAGAN , JONATHAN JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Thrive Chiropractic Health Center Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Thrive Chiropractic Health Center Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Thrive Chiropractic Health Center Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Thrive Chiropractic Health Center Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Thrive Chiropractic Health Center Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Thrive Chiropractic Health Center Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Thrive Chiropractic Health Center Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Thrive Chiropractic Health Center Incorporated, is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle J Phipps